+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2119.).
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 20, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1107 Irwin
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
June 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 14, 2015: AB 1107 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 14, 2015: AB 1107 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor