+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 1468.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 19, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 14, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
May 2, 2019: AB 1107 Chu Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 18
April 24, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor