+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor