+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's item veto stricken from file.
On June 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2013.
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's item veto pending.
- Approved by the Governor with item veto.
On June 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly adopts Conference Committee report. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 2005.).
- Senate adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1362.)
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From Conference Committee: Be adopted. Assembly (Ayes 3 (Blumenfield, Mitchell, and Skinner). Noes 1 (Gorell)). Senate (Ayes 3 (Leno, De Leon, and Hancock). Noes 1 (Emmerson)). To print.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Members Blumenfield, Gorell, Mitchell and Skinner appointed to Conference Committee.
- In the Assembly:
- Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29 suspended. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1780.)
- (Page 1195.)
- (Page 1797.)
- In the Senate:
- Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29 suspended. (Page 1195.)
- Senators Leno, DeLeon, Hancock, and Emmerson appointed to Conference Committee.
- Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 77. Page 1797.)
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1147.).
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1119.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1407.)
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
- (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1315.)
- Ordered to second reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
On January 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 14, 2013: AB 110 BLUMENFIELD Conference Report
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 25
June 14, 2013: Conference Reports AB110 Blumenfield By Leno
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2013: AB 110 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 77
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB110 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
May 13, 2013: AB 110 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Blumenfield
Type:
Primary Sponsor