+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:40 p.m.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 1690.).
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1007.)
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On January 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On January 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On December 4, 2012 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 8, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB11 Logue By Gaines
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
June 12, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2013: AB 11 LOGUE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
April 10, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
March 20, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor