+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 296, Statutes of 2021.
On September 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3043.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2529.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 15).
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1467.)
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 6).
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
September 9, 2021: AB 1096 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1096 Luz Rivas et al. By Durazo
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
June 15, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: AB 1096 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
April 6, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11