+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 243, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2659.).
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1889.).
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1699.)
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 29).
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 22, 2013: AB 1091 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
August 19, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1091 Skinner By Hill
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 19, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
May 29, 2013: AB 1091 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2013: Be referred to Committee on Banking and Finance.
- Yeas: 11
April 29, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor