+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor