+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1937.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 13, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 8, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2017: AB 1085 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor