+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
On August 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On August 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
On June 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 27).
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB S.
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 14.)
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
On May 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
On May 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 28, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On March 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
August 28, 2023: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2023: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2023: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
May 31, 2023: AB 1082 Kalra Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 19
May 18, 2023: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2023: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2