+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2713.).
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2043.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2019: Special Consent AB1075
- Yeas: 40
August 30, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
July 8, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 28, 2019: AB 1075 Holden Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
April 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor