+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On September 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 3153.).
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2602.).
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5).
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 20. Page 1892.)
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 5).
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 10, 2021: AB 1074 Lorena Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CARRILLO
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 10
September 10, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1074 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Durazo
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
July 5, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 3, 2021: AB 1074 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 10
May 5, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2