+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and G.O.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1783.)
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
August 8, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 6, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
June 30, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2021: AB 1072 Reyes Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
April 27, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor