+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 5436.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 5435.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.).
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 29).
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Joint Rules 61 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 4299.)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1181.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.)
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 31, 2020: AB 107 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
August 31, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB107 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2020: Do pass
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
April 11, 2019: AB 107 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor