+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 49, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1611.).
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1528.)
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1479.)
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 19, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1067
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
June 13, 2017: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 15, 2017: AB 1067 GRAY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
May 3, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor