+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 3403.)
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20).
On January 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On January 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (January 10).
On January 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 20, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
June 1, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 27, 2022: AB 1067 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 8
January 20, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
January 10, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor