+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 70, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2485.).
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.).
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5).
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1623.)
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2019: AB 1062 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2019: Consent Calendar AB1062
- Yeas: 40
June 5, 2019: Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 13, 2019: AB 1062 Limón Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor