+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
On July 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 30).
On July 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1180.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.)
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
July 30, 2020: Do pass
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 11, 2019: AB 106 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor