+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
January 9, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
January 9, 2018: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor