+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
May 13, 2015: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor