+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the measure be retained in committee, and that the subject matter be referred to the Committee on Rules for assignment to the proper committee for study. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 29).
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2015: Bill measure be retained in committee, and subject matter be referred to Rules Committee for assignment to the proper committee.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
April 29, 2015: Bill measure be retained in committee, and subject matter be referred to Rules Committee for assignment to the proper committee.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor