+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1872.).
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1477.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1044 Irwin By Gonzalez
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 2, 2019: AB 1044 Irwin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
March 27, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor