+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 15.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 5102.).
On August 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 16. Page 1683.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and INS.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 25, 2022: AB 1041 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 7
August 24, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1041 Wicks et al. By Laird
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
July 5, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 21, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 28, 2021: AB 1041 Wicks Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 10
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2