+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4221.).
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 15).
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3779.)
On January 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 8).
On January 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On March 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
May 21, 2018: Consent Calendar AB1041
- Yeas: 39
May 15, 2018: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
January 16, 2018: AB 1041 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 9
January 8, 2018: 3
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 3
January 8, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 3
April 24, 2017: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor