+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation.
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 14. Page 1678.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 20).
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 8).
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2021: AB 1040 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 14
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor