+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2037.).
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1542.).
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Page 1211.)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1031.).
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 7).
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On January 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On January 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On January 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
- Read first time.
On December 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 11.
On December 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
June 21, 2021: AB 104 Lorena Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
June 17, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB104 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Limón Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 10, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 27, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2021: AB 104 Lorena Gonzalez Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
March 24, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7