+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 4702.).
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after April 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3269.).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 1506.)
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1448.)
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 1).
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
May 1, 2014: AB 1035 PÉREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
April 28, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1035 John A. Pérez By Cannella
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
April 21, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2013: AB 1035 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
April 10, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor