+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3113.).
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2498.).
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 31)
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10).
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and N.R. & W.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1618.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
- Coauthors revised.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 27).
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 11, 2017: AB 1031 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 6, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1031 Waldron et al. By Atkins
- Yeas: 40
August 31, 2017: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 10, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 18, 2017: AB 1031 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
May 10, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
March 27, 2017: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor