+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1591.)
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 26, 2015: AB 1029 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor