+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 353, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2725.).
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2118.).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 1837.).
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 12).
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 2, 2021: AB 1029 Mullin Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
August 26, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1029 Mullin et al. By Becker Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
July 1, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2021: AB 1029 Mullin Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
May 12, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 28, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
April 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1