+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2176.).
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1393.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 21, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1027 Acosta et al. By Wilk
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 6, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
May 4, 2017: AB 1027 ACOSTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2017: No Votes Recorded: Gallagher
- Yeas: 16
April 3, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor