+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 474, Statutes of 2021.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2634.).
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2238.).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1693.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1780.)
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 1, 2021: AB 1024 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 30, 2021: Consent Calendar AB1024
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2021: AB 1024 Santiago Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
April 7, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor