+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Retained in suspense file.
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor