+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 233, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2798.).
On August 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2205.).
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1590.)
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & E.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2019: AB 1017 Boerner Horvath Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 19, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1017 Boerner Horvath et a By Gonzalez
- Yeas: 40
June 18, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
May 9, 2019: AB 1017 Boerner Horvath Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
April 10, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1