+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 3023.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2446.).
On August 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 12).
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 1616.)
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 5, 2019: AB 1014 O'Donnell Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 7
September 3, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1014 O'Donnell et al. By Pan
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 13, 2019: AB 1014 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 21
April 10, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 4
April 2, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 4