+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 661, Statutes of 2021.
On September 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2892.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2892.)
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2893.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2482.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 14).
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 9. Page 1623.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 7).
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On December 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 11.
On December 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 8, 2021: AB 101 MEDINA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 9
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB101 Medina et al. By Durazo
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2021: AB 101 Medina Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 11
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 7, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor