+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 113, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:40 p.m.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2385.).
On July 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1603.).
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1517.)
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1474.)
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 5, 2013: AB 1005 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 6
July 1, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1005 Alejo By Corbett
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 3
June 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
June 11, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 20, 2013: AB 1005 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 8, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10