+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
April 22, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor