+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 567, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2649.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2221.).
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and M. & V.A.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1470.)
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8).
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and M. & V.A.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
September 1, 2021: AB 1002 Choi Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 30, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1002 Choi et al. By Newman
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 16, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 20, 2021: AB 1002 Choi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 12, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
April 28, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
April 8, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1