+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3355.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3353.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2412.).
- (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2407.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 2341.)
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) . Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 1806.)
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On December 4, 2012 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 12, 2013: AB 10 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
September 12, 2013: Assembly 3rd Supp 2 AB10 Alejo By Monning
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
August 30, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 26, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2013: AB 10 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 7
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 24, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2