+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Consent Calendar.
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo.
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 3. Page 1589.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (4)
June 1, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2021: AB 1 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 17
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
April 7, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor