+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 753 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1559ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1559S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106110D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19106110D-S1
- Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102285D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor