+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 2, 2015 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6928-6929)
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S6926)
- S.Amdt.4123 Amendment SA 4123 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4123 Amendment SA 4123 proposed by Senator Pryor for Senator Barrasso. (consideration: CR S6928; text: CR S6928)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6924-6929)
- Introduced in Senate
On July 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 513.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-226.
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-284.
On December 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
S.Amdt.4123
To provide an offset.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor