+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 45 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1499ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101318D
+ − Votes (7)
February 18, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor