+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 470 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB702ER)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 1-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1994: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor