+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 358 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB97ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N)
- Passed House (72-Y 27-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N)
On December 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100486D