+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2012, c.67.
On October 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S1926/2022 (SCS)
On September 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
On May 24, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
On May 14, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 10, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
+ − Votes (5)
October 4, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
October 4, 2012: SUBSTITUTE FOR S1926
- Present/NV: 40
September 20, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
May 24, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 14, 2012: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor