+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
On April 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 502 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB36ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 980884726-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (88-Y 12-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 980884726-H1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 12-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 980884726-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (20-Y 4-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Substitute bill reprinted 980875726-S1
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 980875726-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 9808757726-S1
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 980875726-S1
- Reported from Local Government w/sub. (14-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/98 984922726
+ − Votes (7)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 12-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from C. J. with substitute (20-Y 4-N)
February 27, 1998: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 2-N)
January 28, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1998: Reported from Local Government w/sub. (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor