+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On December 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Concur by Assembly Amendments (Coughlin) (71-9-0)
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concur by Senate Amendments (24-9) (Stack)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (69-5-3)
- Substituted for A3851 (3R)
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Coughlin)
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (31-3)
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (6)
December 19, 2013: CONCUR BY AMEND
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 9
June 27, 2013: CONCUR ASMB AM/AM
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 7
June 24, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
June 24, 2013: SUBSTITUTE FOR A3851 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
March 18, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
March 4, 2013: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor