+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 67 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB402ER)
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (98-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology (19-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 988741635-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 988741635-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 988741635-S1
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 984400408
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
February 20, 1998: Reported from Science and Technology (19-Y 1-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor